MD HB1039 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain community solar energy generating systems from personal property taxes; requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to assess certain land used by a community solar energy generating system in a certain manner; requiring the governing body of a county or of a municipal corporation to grant a tax credit against the property tax imposed on real property on which a certain community solar energy generating system is installed; establishing a tax credit against the State property tax imposed on certain real property; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 126 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-19) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Readings Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {743722/1 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {463927/1 Adopted |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-4) |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB860 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Counties
Energy Matters
Exemptions
Farmland
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Pollution
Prices
Property Tax
Real Property
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Solar Energy
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Agriculture
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Counties
Energy Matters
Exemptions
Farmland
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Pollution
Prices
Property Tax
Real Property
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Solar Energy
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 7 | 237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 8 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 9 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |