MD SB860 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain community solar energy generating systems from personal property taxes; requiring the Department of Assessments and Taxation to assess certain land used by a community solar energy generating system in a certain manner; requiring the governing body of a county or of a municipal corporation to grant a tax credit against the property tax imposed on real property on which a certain community solar energy generating system is installed; establishing a tax credit against the State property tax imposed on certain real property; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Community Solar Energy Generating Systems - Agrivoltaics
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy King [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 659 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-10) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-22) |
2022-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {803123/1 Adopted |
2022-04-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2022-04-07 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2022-04-01 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Floor Amendment {413521/1 (Senator West) Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator West) Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator West) Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {733424/1 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1039 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Construction
Counties
Energy Matters
Exemptions
Farmland
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Parking
Pollution
Property Tax
Real Property
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Solar Energy
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Agriculture
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Baltimore City
Construction
Counties
Energy Matters
Exemptions
Farmland
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Parking
Pollution
Property Tax
Real Property
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Solar Energy
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 7 | 237 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 8 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 9 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |