MD HB1019 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for the form and content of specified livestock production contracts; requiring livestock production contracts to be reviewed by the Attorney General; establishing that contract producers have specified rights; prohibiting specified contractors from engaging in or allowing their employees or agents to engage in specified practices; establishing specified civil and criminal penalties for violation of the Act; providing for enforcement of the Act; etc.
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Agriculture
Animals
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Generally
Contractors
Contracts
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Disclosure
Discrimination
Equipment
Fines
Food
Fraud
Harassment
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Language
Licenses
Liens
Litter
Loans
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Mediation
News Media
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Privacy
Records
Refuse Disposal
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Theft
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment
Agriculture
Animals
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Generally
Contractors
Contracts
Court Costs
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Damages
Disclosure
Discrimination
Equipment
Fines
Food
Fraud
Harassment
Interstate Affairs
Investments
Language
Licenses
Liens
Litter
Loans
Meat, Poultry, Seafood
Mediation
News Media
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Postal Service
Privacy
Records
Refuse Disposal
Rules and Regulations
Subpoenas
Theft
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor and Employment