MA S942 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2550
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2550
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide critical community services. The Judiciary.
Title
To provide critical community services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2550 |
2019-09-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-03-21 | House | House concurred |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H2644 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
S1088 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S92 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H993 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S758 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
H1190 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H871 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2304 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
H594 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4431
S1608 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H1188 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S694 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1525 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2550 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1088 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S92 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S656 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H993 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S758 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Accompanied a study order, see S2991
H1190 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H871 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2304 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
H594 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4431
S1608 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H1188 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S694 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H1525 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S2550 (Replaced by) 2020-02-24 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S942 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S942.pdf |