MA S934 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to direct food donations. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to direct food donations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2496 |
2019-09-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H193 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Accompanied S112
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2241 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1848 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S492 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S1289 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
H3577 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1841 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
S1141 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2241 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
H1848 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S492 (Similar To) 2020-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2683
S962 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1475
S1289 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1617 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2549
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2359 (Similar To) 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2763
H3577 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2496 (Replaced by) 2020-02-06 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S934 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S934.pdf |