MA H3577 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Public Safety and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a firearm violence institute within the Department of Public Health. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an institute within the Department of Public Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S1285 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1706 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S962 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H193 (Similar To) 2019-05-07 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1841 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2192 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - New draft substituted, see S2203
S2213 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-04-25 - Reprinted as amended, see S2213

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback