MA S867 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S1898
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1898
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1898
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prevent discrimination based on veteran's status. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Preventing discrimination based on veteran's status
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Joyce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-28 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S1898 |
2013-06-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Senate Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1898 (Replaced by) 2013-11-14 - New draft substituted, see S1921
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S867 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S867.pdf |