MA S843 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2714
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Senate concurred
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require institutions of higher education to provide uniform financial aid information to accepted applicants. Higher Education.
Title
Requiring institutions of higher education to provide uniform financial aid information to accepted applicants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2714 |
2022-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday April 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-06-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1750 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S2499 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2714 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1350 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4697
S1898 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S2499 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S1588 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2714 (Replaced by) 2022-02-28 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1350 (Similar To) 2022-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4697
S1898 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S843 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S843.pdf |