MA S774 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to restore the Commonwealth's public housing. Housing.
Title
Restoring the Commonwealths public housing
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Boncore [D] | Sen. Paul Feeney [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Sen. Michael Moore [D] |
Rep. David LeBoeuf [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S791 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H1313 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
S985 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1212 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1244 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S792 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H1313 (Similar To) 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4943
S985 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S1212 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1244 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2547
S792 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S774 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S774.pdf |