MA S745 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2404
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the eligibility of households for inclusion in a municipality's affordable housing inventory. Housing.
Title
Relative to expanding the eligibility of households for inclusion in a municipality’s affordable housing inventory
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2404 |
2017-12-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S744 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S51 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1315 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H33 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
S2404 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S51 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1315 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H33 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4085 (Similar To) 2018-05-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 92 of the Acts of 2018
S2404 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S745 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S745.pdf |