MA H33 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Department of the State Treasurer (House, No. 23) as relates to eligible prior service. Public Service.
Title
Relative to eligible prior service
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-04-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S51 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S744 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S594 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3558 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3938 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2018
H3838 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S51 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S744 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S594 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H3558 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3938 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2018
H3838 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H33 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H33.pdf |