MA S744 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2404
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to expand the eligibility of households for inclusion in a municipality's affordable housing inventory. Housing.
Title
Relative to expanding the eligibility of households for inclusion in a municipality’s affordable housing inventory
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2404 |
2017-12-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
S731 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S51 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S737 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S91 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2360
S738 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H33 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2404 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S51 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S737 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S91 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2360
S738 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2404
S1384 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S648 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1611 (Similar To) 2017-08-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3851
H3693 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4004
H703 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H3015 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4791
H33 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2404 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S744 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S744.pdf |