MA H3938 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the civil service eligibility of John Patrick Ryan for the position of police officer in the city of Quincy. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the civil service eligibility list for police officers in the city of Quincy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-18 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2018
2018-01-11SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-01-11HouseEnacted
2018-01-08SenateRead second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed
2018-01-08SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2017-12-18SenateRead and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2017-12-14HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2017-12-11HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-12-11HouseRules suspended
2017-12-11HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2017-12-07HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-10-24JointHearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
2017-10-05SenateSenate concurred
2017-10-04HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H409 (Similar To) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4579
S1932 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S1933 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1140 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H393 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1794 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H4082 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Amended by substitution of a bill, H4298

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback