MA S741 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-4)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to commit to higher education the resources to Insure a strong and healthy public higher education system. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Committing to higher education the resources to Insure a strong and healthy public higher education system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11JointHearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H476 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1992 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H481 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Senate concurred
H1208 (Similar To) 2019-03-19 - Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H8 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S755 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H254 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S768 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S1471 (Similar To) 2019-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S750 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H1143 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback