MA S667 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to improve access to dental care in the Commonwealth. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving access to dental care in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2019-04-24JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H726 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S728 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S730 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1936 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H1988 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1002 (Similar To) 2020-12-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H5160
S151 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4298
H602 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
H747 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5124
H741 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5078
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - New draft substituted, see S2296
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4017 (Similar To) 2019-10-07 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 82 of the Acts of 2019

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback