MA S477 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote snowmobiling sustainability . Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting snowmobiling sustainability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S95 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1216 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H121 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1293 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S2091 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2097 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Accompanied S2042
S449 (Similar To) 2019-04-17 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/23/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
H2412 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H848 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2224 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - House concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback