MA S426 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2650
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2650
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the safety of seniors in assisted living facilities. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to the safety of seniors in assisted living facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2650 |
2021-09-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/27/2021 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1422 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
S751 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2650 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S421 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
S751 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2650 (Replaced by) 2022-02-10 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S421 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S426 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S426.pdf |