MA S751 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to make a technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for Patient Safety and Medical Error Reduction enabling statute. Health Care Financing.
Title
Making technical changes to the Betsy Lehman Center for patient safety and medical error reduction enabling statute
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Accompanied by H1241 |
2021-10-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1241 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied S751
S1422 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
H4929 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2022
H5358 (Similar To) 2022-10-20 - Text of an amendment, see H4929
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
S1417 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
S1422 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
S1428 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2772
S1376 (Similar To) 2022-01-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
H4929 (Similar To) 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 254 of the Acts of 2022
H5358 (Similar To) 2022-10-20 - Text of an amendment, see H4929
H2398 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5461
S1417 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S751 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S751.pdf |