MA S370 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2399

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish permanent voter registration for registered voters who move within the Commonwealth. Election Laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish sticky voter registration for registered voters who move within the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-04SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2399
2017-05-25JointHearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws

Same As/Similar To

S373 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2091 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2092 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H353 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2079 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H2080 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
S2399 (Replaced by) 2018-04-09 - Reported (in part) by S2069

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback