MA H353 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4252
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish election day voter registration. Election Laws.
Title
To establish election day registration
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Rep. Jose Tosado [D] | Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] | Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4252 |
2017-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Election Laws |
Same As/Similar To
S327 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S371 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S367 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S370 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S373 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2091 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2092 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4252 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S371 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S367 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S370 (Similar To) 2018-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2399
S373 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2091 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4320
H2092 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H4252 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H353 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H353.pdf |