MA S360 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2756

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation for the end of Common Core, and establishing certain other curriculum standards. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

For the end of Common Core, and establishing certain other curriculum standards

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-14SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2756
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H3485 (Similar To) 2022-01-11 - Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H578 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2541 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H622 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S202 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
S311 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2785
S310 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2748
S1570 (Similar To) 2021-10-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2756 (Replaced by) 2022-03-21 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback