MA S334 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S221
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied S221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-11 - Accompanied S221
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to birth to 3 early education. Education.
Title
Relative to birth to 3 early education
Sponsors
Sen. James Welch [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Accompanied S221 |
2017-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S193 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2486
S29 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S318 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S30 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S954 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1008 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H797 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H799 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H3801 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2272 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H22 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S221 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
H4852 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S29 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S318 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S30 (Similar To) 2017-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S954 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H263 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1008 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H797 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H799 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H111 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H3801 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2272 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H22 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S221 (Replaced by) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4815 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 202 of the Acts of 2018
H4852 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S334 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S334.pdf |