MA H22 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Teachers’ Retirement Board (House, No. 21) as relates to the forfeiture of pension upon conviction of child pornography and other offenses. Public Service.
Title
Related to the forfeiture of pension upon conviction of child pornography and other offenses
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2017-04-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1404 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1480 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H4555 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1480 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H4555 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H22 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H22.pdf |