MA S318 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide child exploitation awareness education. Education.
Title
To provide child exploitation awareness education
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2424 |
2017-07-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 428 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1203 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1713 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1723 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1717 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1706 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1742 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2137
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2137 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2017
S2424 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1713 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S1723 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1717 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1706 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1742 (Similar To) 2017-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2137
H3802 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H4792
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2137 (Similar To) 2017-11-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 134 of the Acts of 2017
S2424 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S318 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S318.pdf |