MA S29 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2313
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote child well-being, community supervision and efficient use of state resources. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
To promote child well-being, community supervision and efficient use of state resources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2313 |
2018-01-30 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2018-01-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/30/2018 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-08-31 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on the Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S66 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S44 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S806 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
S950 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S318 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S468 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1254 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1196 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S1142 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H403 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S44 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S806 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2500
S950 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
S318 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S647 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S468 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1254 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S1196 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S1142 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Accompanied a study order, see S2342
H2500 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H662 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4740
H403 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4571
S2313 (Replaced by) 2018-03-29 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S29 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S29.pdf |