MA S318 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2495

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to student sex education. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to healthy youth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-19SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2495
2021-05-17JointHearing scheduled for 05/20/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S2495 (Replaced by) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
H673 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
S2541 (Similar To) 2021-09-27 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2534 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Reprinted as amended, see S2541

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback