MA S3153 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-19 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-19 - House concurred
Pending: Joint Public Service Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the retirement of Greg Heath, a former firefighter to the city of Westfield. Public Service. [Local approval received]
Title
Relative to the retirement of Greg Heath, a former firefighter to the city of Westfield
Sponsors
Sen. John Velis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-19 | House | House concurred |
2022-12-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1721 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Accompanied H19
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
S2566 (Similar To) 2022-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2022
H5133 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5156
H5156 (Similar To) 2022-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2022
H5069 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5133
S1736 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1749 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1672 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1711 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S246 (Similar To) 2021-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2566
S2566 (Similar To) 2022-01-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 9 of the Acts of 2022
H5133 (Similar To) 2022-07-31 - New draft substituted, see H5156
H5156 (Similar To) 2022-10-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 249 of the Acts of 2022
H5069 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5133
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3153 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3153.pdf |