MA S3112 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2885
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 253 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on November 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 253 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the town of Avon to grant one additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 3112).
Title
Authorizing the town of Avon to grant one additional license for the sale of all alcoholic beverages not to be drunk on the premises
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Sen. Walter Timilty [D] | Rep. William Galvin [D] | Sen. Michael Brady [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-01 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 253 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2022-10-31 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2022-10-27 | House | Enacted |
2022-10-27 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-29 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-09-29 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-09-29 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-09-26 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2022-09-22 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-08-29 | Senate | New draft of S2885 |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S2885 (Replaces) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S3112
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H453 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S247 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2871
S238 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H453 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S247 (Similar To) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2871
S238 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2501
S2488 (Similar To) 2022-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4663
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3112 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S3112.pdf |