MA S2871 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S247
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote economic recovery for restaurants and bars, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2871).
Title
To facilitate outdoor dining
Sponsors
House Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure | Sen. John Velis [D] | Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2022-05-09 | Senate | New draft of S247 |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S247 (Replaces) 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2871
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2224 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4273
H411 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S196 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2005 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2145 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H4524
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S211 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2022-07-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2224 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4273
H411 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
S196 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2005 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2871 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2871.pdf |