MA S283 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2410
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit the Commonwealth from discrimination against those providing special education services to Massachusetts students. Education.
Title
Prohibiting the Commonwealth from discrimination against those providing special education services to Massachusetts students under the authority and direction of chapter 71B of the General Laws of Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Accompanied by H2410 |
2015-09-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/08/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-06-24 | House | House concurred |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2015-06-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/17/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H2410 (Replaces) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied S283
S1149 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1017 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1228 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S335 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S556 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1559 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S438 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1149 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1017 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1228 (Similar To) 2016-07-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S255 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S1089 (Similar To) 2015-09-28 - Accompanied H1831
H85 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S335 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4141
S556 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1361 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1559 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S473 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S438 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S283.pdf |