MA S2731 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 436 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-2)
Status: Passed on January 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 436 of the Acts of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanding equitable access to maternal postpartum care (Senate, No. 2583),- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment substituting a new draft with the same title (Senate, No. 2731).
Title
Relative to expanding equitable access to maternal postpartum care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Engrossed Roll Call #131 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 436 of the Acts of 2022 | |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2023-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2023-01-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2023-01-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-01-03 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-01-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-01-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-01-03 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2022-03-07 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed to be engrossed -see Roll Call #131 (Yeas 40 to Nays 0) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for S2583 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Recommended new draft for S2583 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S799 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2583
H1297 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2583
S2583 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2731
S741 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1297 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2583
S2583 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2731
S741 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S739 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2731 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2731.pdf |
Roll Call | https://malegislature.gov/RollCall/192/SenateRollCall131.pdf |