MA S2683 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 401 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 401 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Cheryl Ann Gracia, an employee of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Cheryl Ann Gracia, an employee of the Trial Court of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 401 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2019-01-01 | Senate | Laid before the Governor |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | House | Enacted |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-31 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2018-12-31 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-12-31 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-12-31 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Read, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2018-12-10 | House | House concurred |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Senate Rule 20 and Joint Rule 12 suspended |
Same As/Similar To
H4957 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 396 of the Acts of 2018
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
S2695 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4943 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
H4980 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4992 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 398 of the Acts of 2018
H4954 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Pocket vetoed
S2695 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2683 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2683.pdf |