MA S2620 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - House adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-27 - House adopted, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to granting the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure until May 15, 2020 within which time to make its final report on on all matters referred to them.
Title
Extension Order - Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Feeney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-27 | House | House adopted, in concurrence |
2020-04-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-04-13 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2620 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2620.pdf |