MA S2603 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Jessica Zamansky, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transitional Assistance. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jessica Zamansky, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Transitional Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 85 of the Acts of 2020 | |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2020-05-21 | House | Enacted |
2020-05-18 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-05-18 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2020-05-13 | House | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-04-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-04-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-04-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2020-04-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2020-03-18 | House | House concurred |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2603 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2603.pdf |