MA S258 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2254
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to mandating a curriculum in the public schools on personal financial literacy. Education.
Title
Relative to financial literacy curriculum
Sponsors
Sen. Viriato deMacedo [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Sen. Robert Hedlund [R] | Sen. Bruce Tarr [R] |
Sen. Donald Humason [R] | Rep. James Cantwell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2254 |
2015-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2254 (Replaced by) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1518 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S279 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S341 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S328 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2343
S275 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S498 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
H488 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H519 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S619
S201 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1518 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S279 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S341 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
S328 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2343
S275 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S498 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S1994 (Similar To) 2016-02-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 31 of the Acts of 2016
H488 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H519 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S619
S201 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S258 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S258.pdf |