MA S341 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2338
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2338
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to promote alternative dispute resolution for students. Education.
Title
To promote alternative dispute resolution for students
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2338 |
2015-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S2338 (Replaced by) 2016-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S275 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S263 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S295 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S293 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S1203 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S827 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1313 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S854 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1247 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S275 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S263 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S295 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2315
S293 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2336
S1203 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H453 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S827 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1313 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S854 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1247 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S341 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S341.pdf |