MA H519 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S619
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-05 - Accompanied S619
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of income for spouses of nursing home residents. Elder Affairs.
Title
Relative to the calculation of income for spouses of nursing home residents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Senate | Accompanied S619 |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-10-15 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/19/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S619 (Replaced by) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H542 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2016
H2566 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H75 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H126 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S357 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H527 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
S497 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
S499 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H1005 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H542 (Similar To) 2016-07-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 156 of the Acts of 2016
H2566 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H75 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H126 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S357 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H527 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass with an amendment and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
S497 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S272 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2341
S499 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
H1005 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H519 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H519.pdf |