MA S2570 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 20 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for a medical exemption for manufacturer coupons. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide for a medical exemption for manufacturer coupons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-02JointHearing scheduled for 03/10/2020 from 11:00 AM-12:30 PM in A-2
2020-02-26HouseHouse concurred
2020-02-24SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2020-02-24SenateRules suspended
2019-11-20SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback