MA S2506 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 417 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 417 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Nereida Prats, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Nereida Prats, an employee of the Department of Developmental Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-12 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 417 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2017-01-03 | House | Enacted |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-01-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2017-01-03 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-15 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-12-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-12-15 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-12-12 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-12-08 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2016-11-28 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2016-11-14 | House | House concurred |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2016-10-27 | Senate | Senate Rule 20 and Joint Rule 12 suspended |
Same As/Similar To
S2510 (Similar To) 2016-12-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2514 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S10 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2015
S1441 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1372 (Similar To) 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1336 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied H3285
S1341 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2514 (Similar To) 2016-12-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1368 (Similar To) 2015-04-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
S14 (Similar To) 2015-02-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S15
H2281 (Similar To) 2015-05-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 28 of the Acts of 2015
S1330 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S10 (Similar To) 2015-03-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 6 of the Acts of 2015
S1441 (Similar To) 2015-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1261 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1372 (Similar To) 2016-07-18 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1336 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied H3285
S1341 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1896 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2506 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2506.pdf |