MA S2494 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S303
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the training, assessment, and assignment of qualified school interpreters in educational settings, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2494).
Title
Relative to the training, assessment, and assignment of qualified school interpreters in educational settings
Sponsors
House Committee on Education | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Jack Lewis [D] | Sen. Jason Lewis [D] |
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D] | Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-07-19 | Senate | New draft of S303 |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S303 (Replaces) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2494
H552 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3979
S2450 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2021
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H3979 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1769 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S316 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H610 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H621 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
H552 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3979
S2450 (Similar To) 2021-09-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2021
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H3979 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1769 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1610 (Similar To) 2022-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1488 (Similar To) 2022-01-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4330
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
S316 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1490 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2800
S334 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S1657 (Similar To) 2022-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H610 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H621 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5099
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2494 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2494.pdf |