MA S2455 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4241
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - See H4241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - See H4241
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Similar Bills
Title
Similar Bills
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Amendment #14 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Amendment #12 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Amendment #5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Amendment #1 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Amendment #12 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Amendment #5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate Amendment #1 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | See H4241 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Substituted, as amended, for H4241 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Spilka) adopted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Tarr) adopted- see Roll Call #359 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #12 (L'Italien) adopted-see Roll Call #358 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #10 (Cyr) adopted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #8 (Rodrigues) rejected |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #7 (Rodrigues) adopted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #5 (Creem) adopted-see Roll Call #357 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Tarr) adopted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tarr) adopted |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brownsberger) adopted- see Roll Call #356 (Yeas 38 to Nays 0) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Recommended new text for H4241 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S1031 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied S985
H2372 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H3153
H134 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H3153 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4241 (Replaced by) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
H4806 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 444 of the Acts of 2018
H2372 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H3153
H134 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H3153 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4241 (Replaced by) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
H4806 (Similar To) 2019-01-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 444 of the Acts of 2018