MA H3153 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the use of credit reports by employers. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Regulating the use of credit reports by employers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-05-31 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-05-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-04-19 | House | Accompanied by H2372 |
2017-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S985 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1031 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied S985
S1044 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S1627 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2372 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H3153
H1029 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1579 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S565 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4241 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
S1031 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied S985
S1044 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2490
S1627 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2372 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied H3153
H1029 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
H1579 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S565 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
H4229 (Similar To) 2018-02-14 - New draft substituted, see H4232
H4241 (Similar To) 2018-12-27 - Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a new draft, see H4806
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3153 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3153.pdf |