MA S2425 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Introduced on October 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-02 - Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to emergency insulin access. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to emergency insulin access

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-02JointHearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2019-11-26HouseHouse concurred
2019-11-07SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health
2019-11-07SenateRules suspended
2019-10-17SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H1002 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 10/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
S151 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/15/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H1988 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing scheduled for 12/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
H3113 (Similar To) 2019-10-10 - Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback