MA S2613 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2425
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to emergency insulin access, reports he accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2613).
Title
Relative to emergency insulin access
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-23 | Senate | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2020-03-26 | Senate | New draft of S2425 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2425 (Replaces) 2020-03-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2613
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2613 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2613.pdf |