MA S2415 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2652

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - New draft (Crighton) substituted, see S2652
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to change the elected term for select board members from 1 year to 3 years in the town of Marblehead. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local approval received]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing the elected term for select board members from 1 year to 3 years in the town of Marblehead

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15SenateNew draft (Crighton) substituted, see S2652
2024-02-15SenateRead third
2024-02-15SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2024-01-11SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-11-13SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2023-09-19JointHearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2023-07-17HouseHouse concurred
2023-07-13SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

S2652 (Replaced by) 2024-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 53 of the Acts of 2024
S2487 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2024
H4097 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2024
S2784 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
H4682 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback