MA S2487 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize changing the name of board of selectmen to select board and the title of selectmen to select board member in the town of Charlton. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing changing the name of board of selectmen to select board and the title of selectmen to select board member in the town of Charlton

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-04 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 70 of the Acts of 2024
2024-03-28SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2024-03-28HouseEnacted
2024-03-25HouseRead third and passed to be engrossed
2024-03-14HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-03-14HouseRules suspended
2024-03-14HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-02-15HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2024-02-12SenateRead third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed
2024-02-12SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2024-01-18SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2023-12-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
2023-11-07JointHearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2023-10-30HouseHouse concurred
2023-10-26SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H4097 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 62 of the Acts of 2024
S2371 (Similar To) 2024-03-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 64 of the Acts of 2024
S2784 (Similar To) 2024-06-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4682 (Similar To) 2024-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H4818 (Similar To) 2024-07-10 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2024 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback