MA H4097 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-09 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Municipalities and Regional Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

That the town of Merrimac be authorized to increase the number of select board members in said town. Municipalities and Regional Government. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing the membership of the select board of the town of Merrimac from 3 members to 5 members

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-09JointHearing scheduled for 10/17/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2023-09-21SenateSenate concurred
2023-09-18HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback