MA S2385 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2375
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 373 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on November 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 373 of the Acts of 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a sick leave bank for Joseph Quinn, an employee of the Trial Court
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Joseph Quinn, an employee of the Trial Court
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 373 of the Acts of 2014 | |
2014-11-06 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2014-11-03 | House | Enacted |
2014-11-03 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-11-03 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2014-10-31 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-10-23 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-10-23 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-10-23 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2014-10-20 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Substituted for S2375 |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2014-10-16 | Senate | New draft of S2375 |
2014-10-16 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2375 (Replaces) 2014-10-16 - New draft substituted, see S2385
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/Senate/S2385 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/Senate/S2385.pdf |