MA S2373 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Daniel Kiley, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Mental Health. Public Service.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Daniel Kiley, an employee of the Massachusetts Department of Mental Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 130 of the Acts of 2019 | |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2019-11-19 | House | Enacted |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-11-18 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2019-11-18 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2019-11-06 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-06 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-06 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2019-11-04 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Taken out of the Orders of the Day |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-24 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee |
2019-10-16 | House | House concurred |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2019-10-10 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-10-03 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
Same As/Similar To
S5 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 1 of the Acts of 2019
S6 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2019
H1719 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1153
H3578 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1163 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4151 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2019
H4156 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2019
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S6 (Similar To) 2019-01-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 2 of the Acts of 2019
H1719 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1153
H3578 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722
S1163 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4151 (Similar To) 2019-11-18 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 116 of the Acts of 2019
H4156 (Similar To) 2019-11-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 108 of the Acts of 2019
S2415 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2020
H4237 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2020
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020
S2442 (Similar To) 2020-01-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2373 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S2373.pdf |