MA S1163 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Mental Health, Substance Abuse and Recovery Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to creating intensive stabilization and treatment units within the Department of Mental Health. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to creating intensive stabilization and treatment units within the Department of Mental Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S1311 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S222 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1172 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S1140 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1119 (Similar To) 2019-04-08 - House concurred
H1914 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
S561 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1751 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/11/2019 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in A-1
H112 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H96 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S543 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S1308 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2278
S542 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2278 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Placed in the Orders of the day for Thursday, July 25, 2019
S2296 (Similar To) 2019-07-18 - Recommended new draft for S2278

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback